[Music]

welcome to math with mr j

[Music]

in this video i'm going to cover how to

multiply three digit numbers by three

digit numbers

so let's get into our two examples here

and find the product of each

and when i say product that means the

answer to a multiplication problem

so for number one we have 819 times 237

so the first thing we need to do is line

this problem up

so we have 819 times

237 make sure you line up all your

places

so the nine and seven are lined up

because they are in the ones place

the one and three because they are in

the tens and then the eight

and 2 because they are in the hundreds

now we're ready to multiply so what

we're going to do we're going to do

7 times 819 30 times 819

and then 200 times 819

add all of those up and that will give

us our final answer

and i said 30 because that 3 in 237

is in the tens place so it has a value

of 30.

and i said 200 because that 2 in 237 has

a value of 200

because it's in the hundreds place so

let's start

and we start by doing 7 times 9

which is 63 so we put our 3 and carry

the 6. now we have 7 times

10 but we can just think of it as 7

times 1

and look at these as the basic digits

now i said 10

because that 1 is in the tens place so

it has a value of 10.

but let's just think of it as the digits

themselves like i said so seven times

one

is seven plus six is thirteen

so we put our three and carry the one

now we have seven times eight hundred

but we can just think of it as seven

times eight

which is 56 plus that one is 57

so we put our seven and we don't have

any more digits

to carry over to so we drop our five

and we get an answer of five thousand

seven hundred thirty three

we are done with the seven here the six

and the one

i like to cross things off as we go uh

when we are done with them that way we

don't get confused with any other

numbers that are carried

later in the problem so now we move to

the 30

that has a value of or i'm sorry we move

to the 3 that has a value of 30.

so we put a 0 here for our next step

and that represents that 30. it helps us

represent the 30

rather than just saying it is a 3.

so now we do 3 times 9 which is 27

carry our 2. 3 times one

is three plus two is five and then three

times eight

is twenty-four so we are done with this

three

and then the two so we moved the two

in 237 which has a value of 200 it's in

the hundreds place

so we need two zeros for this next

number again that's to represent the

200 so now we do 2 times nine is

eighteen

carry the one two times

one is two plus that one is three

and then we have two times eight which

is sixteen

so now we can add all of these up these

are our partial products so they are

part of our final product or

answer there add them up and we get our

final answer

so three plus uh a couple of zeros there

is three three plus seven is

ten carry our one one plus seven is

eight

plus five is thirteen plus eight is

twenty one two plus five is seven

plus four is eleven plus three is

fourteen

one plus two is three plus six is nine

and then we end with a one here and we

get a final answer of one hundred ninety

four thousand

one hundred three so on to number two

and we can line up our problem

338 times 193 so let's go through our

steps and

we will go a little quicker as we work

through number two

three times eight is twenty-four

three times three is nine plus two is

eleven

3 times 3 is 9 plus 1

is 10 so we are done done

and done we move to the 9 which has a

value of 90

so we need a 0 here nine times eight

is seventy-two

nine times three is twenty-seven plus

seven is thirty-four

nine times three is twenty-seven plus 3

is 30. so we are done here done here

and done here now we have 100 times 338

so that 1 has a value of 100 so we need

two zeros now

one times eight is eight one times three

is three and one times three is three

so we have our three partial products

and we are ready to add them up

in order to get our final answer so four

plus zero

plus zero is four one plus two plus zero

is three zero plus four is four

plus eight is twelve one plus one is two

plus three is five and then we end with

three plus three which is

six so we get sixty five thousand

two hundred thirty four so there you

have it there's how you multiply

three digit numbers by three digit

numbers i hope that helped thanks so

much for watching

until next time peace