[Music]

welcome to math with mr j

[Music]

in this video i'm going to cover how to

multiply three digit numbers by two

digit numbers

so let's jump into our two examples here

and find the product of each

now remember product means the answer to

a multiplication problem

so for number one we have 239 times 54

and the first thing we need to do is

line this problem up

so we can write 239

times 54. now when writing this problem

it's important that all of our places

are lined up so for example

our 9 and 4 are lined up because they

are both in the ones place

the 3 and 5 are lined up because they

are both in the tens place

and then the 2 is lined up with nothing

below that because 54

doesn't have a digit in the hundreds

place so now that we're lined up we're

ready to multiply

and what we're going to do we're going

to do 4 times 239

and then 50 times 239 and we're doing

50 because the 5 and 54 has a value

of 50. and then we add those two answers

together

to get our final product or answer so

let's start with 4 times 9

which is 36. so we put our 6 here

and we carry our 3 that has a value of

30

over to the tens place now we're doing 4

times 30 because that 3 is in the tens

place

but we can just think of it as 4 times 3

and then add that 3 that we carried

so 4 times 3 is 12 plus 3

is 15.

carry our one now we do four times

two hundred or just think of it as four

times two which is eight

plus that one is nine

so four times 239 is 956

but that's not our final answer we still

need to do 50 times 239

so we are done with this one that we

carried and the three

i'm crossing those off just so we don't

get confused with any other numbers

we need to carry and i'm also going to

cross this 4 off because we are done

with it

now we're going to do 50 times 239

so we need a zero here because we're

moving over to the tens place and that

five has a value of 50. so we put a zero

there to represent that

now we need to do five times nine three

and two just like we did with the four

in our first step so five times 9 is 45

so we put our 5 here carry the 4.

now we do 5 times 3 plus that 4

which is 19 carry the 1

and then 5 times 2 is 10 plus that 1

is 11. now we can add these two numbers

together these are called

our partial products and it makes sense

because they are part

of the final product or answer so 6

plus 0 is six five plus five is

ten one plus nine is ten plus nine is

nineteen

one plus one is two and we just have a

one there that we can drop down

and we get a final answer of twelve

thousand

nine hundred six so on to number two

first thing we set the problem up six

hundred twenty eight

times seventy three

so we need to do 3 times 628 and then

70 times 628 add those answers together

to get our final answer

so 3 times 8 is 24

carry our 2 3 times 2

is six plus two is eight

three times six is eighteen

we are done with this three and then

also that two

that we carried so we need a zero here

for our next step because that's 7

has a value of 70. we're moving over to

the tens place

so now we do 7 times 8 which is 56

carry our 5. 7 times 2 is 14

plus five is nineteen seven times six

is forty-two plus one is forty

three so we have our partial products

and we

are ready to add so four plus zero is

four

eight plus six is fourteen one plus

eight is nine

plus nine is eighteen one plus one is

two

plus three is five and then we have a

four down here

so we get a final product or answer of

45

844 so there you have it there's how you

multiply

three digit numbers by two digit numbers

i hope that helped

thanks so much for watching until next

time peace